CA AB672 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3007.05 of the Penal Code, and to add Section 14903 to the Vehicle Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: wrongful convictions: assistance upon release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 672 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB672 Jones-Sawyer By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 672 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB672 Jones-Sawyer By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 672 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3143.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2703.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1869.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3007.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14903 | New Code | See Bill Text |