CA AB671 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1191 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Assembly - AB 671 CHÁVEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB671 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 671 CHÁVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB671 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 671 CHÁVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2679.). |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2070.). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1129.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |