CA AB67 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-31 - Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 37. Page 6585.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 511.5 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Double Pay on the Holiday Act of 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 67 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 31 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB67 Gonzalez By Allen (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 67 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 67 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-31AssemblyAssembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 37. Page 6585.)
2016-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2016-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5494.).
2016-08-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-08-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-06-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2016-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 8).
2016-05-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2016-02-04SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2016-01-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 3508.)
2016-01-25AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3474.)
2016-01-20AssemblyFrom inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
2016-01-19AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gonzalez.
2015-06-08AssemblyReconsideration granted. (Page 1943.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gonzalez.
2015-06-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1903.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 34. Page 1928.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gonzalez.
2015-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 28).
2015-04-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2015-03-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2015-01-05AssemblyRead first time.
2014-12-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 17.
2014-12-17AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code511.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_67&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_bill_20141217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_bill_20150602_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_bill_20150603_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_bill_20160125_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_bill_20160519_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_bill_20160614_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_bill_20160803_amended_sen_v93.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_vote_20150318_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_vote_20150604_0243PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_vote_20160127_0103PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_vote_20160608_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_vote_20160829_0505PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_67_vote_20160831_1121PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback