CA AB67 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1203.077 to the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing: methamphetamine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2011-03-15 In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2011-01-27 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2011-01-03 Read first time.
2010-12-14 From printer. May be heard in committee January 13.
2010-12-13 Introduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1203.077New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback