CA AB668 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89320 of the Education Code, relating to the California State University.
Title
California State University: examinations: undue
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 668 BLOCK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB668 Block By Lowenthal (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 668 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB668 Block By Lowenthal (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 668 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2912.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2192.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-30 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66015.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |