CA AB668 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 602 of the Penal Code, relating to trespass.
Title
Trespass.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Assembly - AB 668 LIEU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB668 Lieu By Correa (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 668 LIEU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB668 Lieu By Correa (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 668 LIEU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-09 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6794.) | |
2010-08-26 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26). | |
2010-08-25 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4843.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-09 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-04 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-05-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1958.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |