CA AB667 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 119, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 119, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1750.1 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 104830 of, and to add Section 104762 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to oral health.
Title
Topical fluoride application.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB667 Block By Alquist (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 667 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 667 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 119, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2009-07-09 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1667.) | |
2009-07-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1628.) | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13). | |
2009-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1750.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104762 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |