CA AB666 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13307.7 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: voter information guides: candidate statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 666 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB666 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Dodd (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 666 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB666 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Dodd (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 666 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6133.). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5045.). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2018-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3780.) |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 10). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13307.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |