CA AB665 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 6924 of the Family Code, relating to minors.
Title
Minors: consent to mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 665 Wendy Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB665 Wendy Carrillo et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - AB 665 Wendy Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB665 Wendy Carrillo et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - AB 665 Wendy Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 3040.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2417.). |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2023-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 9. Page 1077.) |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |