CA AB665 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 200, 203.1, and 3004 of, and to add Sections 200.5 and 200.6 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Hunting or fishing: local regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB665 Frazier By Berryhill (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 665 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 665 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2567.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 12000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 200.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 200.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 203.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |