CA AB660 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7145.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Chapter 1.9 (commencing with Section 13200) to Part 2 of Division 12 of, and to repeal Sections 13200.02 and 13200.05 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire suppression.
Title
Sprinkler fitters: licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 660 TORRICO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 660 TORRICO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-29 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-26 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-25 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 23). | |
2009-06-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1882.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 22). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and B. & P. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7145.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13200.02 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13200.05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |