CA AB66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12525.2 of the Government Code, and to add Section 832.14 to the Penal Code, relating to police use of force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police: use of force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 66 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-17SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3888.)
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2020-01-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-01-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2019-04-24AssemblyMeasure version as amended on April 22 corrected.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-03-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12525.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.14New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback