CA AB659 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14105.22 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 659 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB659 Ridley-Thomas By Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 659 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB659 Ridley-Thomas By Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 659 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3291.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.) |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2699.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1977.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |