CA AB659 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 6018.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: consumer: garment cleaner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-31 - Assembly - AB 659 HAYASHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AB659 Hayashi By Wolk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 659 HAYASHI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AB659 Hayashi By Wolk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 659 HAYASHI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-31 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2804.) | |
2009-08-27 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1978.) | |
2009-08-24 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-08-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-15 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-14 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1767.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20). | |
2009-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6018.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |