CA AB657 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.2 (commencing with Section 870) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts: expedited licensure process: applicants providing abortions.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 657 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB657 Cooper By Kamlager (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-06-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 657 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB657 Cooper By Kamlager (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-06-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 657 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5123.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and G.O. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 1729.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 870 | New Code | See Bill Text |