CA AB657 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11148.5 of the Government Code, relating to small business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: small business liaisons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB657 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 657 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-21 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2017-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1842.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1391.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28).
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2017-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11148.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback