CA AB656 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 131250) to Part 1 of Division 112 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Office of Healthy and Safe Communities.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - 05/16/19 (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 656 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - 05/16/19 (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 656 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 2154.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 131250 | New Code | See Bill Text |