CA AB654 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 14132.78 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pediatric home health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-06-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2017-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132.78Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback