CA AB654 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 47021 and 47026 of, to amend the heading of Article 4 (commencing with Section 47025) of Chapter 10.5 of Division 17 of, and to add the heading of Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 47022) to Chapter 10.5 of Division 17 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to direct marketing of agricultural products.
Title
Direct marketing: certified farmers' markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 654 HALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB654 Hall By Evans (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 654 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB654 Hall By Evans (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 654 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3200.). |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (September 10). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and APPR. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3032.) |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2180.). |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1332.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 47021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 47022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 47026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |