CA AB654 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50281, 50281.1, 50282, 50284, and 50287 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: historical property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Assembly - AB 654 HUESO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB654 Hueso By Wolk (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 654 HUESO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB654 Hueso By Wolk (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 654 HUESO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2494.). | |
2011-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-18 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1962.). | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1508.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-30 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-03-29 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 22). | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and L. GOV. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 50281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50281.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50284 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50287 | Amended Code | Citation Text |