CA AB651 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5914, 5915, 5916, 5917, 5920, 5921, 5922, and 5923 of, and to add Section 5926 to, the Corporations Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Nonprofit health facilities: sale of assets: Attorney General approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Assembly - AB 651 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB651 Muratsuchi By Lara (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 651 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB651 Muratsuchi By Lara (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 651 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3222.). |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3206.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2713.). |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1539.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 28). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 5914 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5916 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5923 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5926 | New Code | See Bill Text |