CA AB651 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 3253.5 and 3303.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public safety officers and firefighters: investigations and interviews.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 651 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 1331.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3253.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3303.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |