CA AB65 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65302 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 31113 and 71154 of the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal protection.
Title
Coastal protection: climate adaption: project prioritization: natural infrastructure: local general plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 65 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB65 Petrie-Norris et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 65 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB65 Petrie-Norris et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 65 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3393.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2743.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1255.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 31113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |