CA AB65 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1464 of, and to add Title 14 (commencing with Section 14400) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Local law enforcement: body-worn cameras: grant program.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 17. |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14400 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1464 | Amended Code | Citation Text |