CA AB645 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 23640, 26835, and 31640 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: warning statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 645 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB645 Irwin By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 645 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB645 Irwin By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 645 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 7. Page 2894.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 2284.). |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 1352.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 23640 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26835 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 31640 | New Code | See Bill Text |