CA AB644 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 472 of, and to add and repeal Sections 435.5 and 439 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.
Title
Civil procedure: pleadings.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB644 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 644 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 644 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2350.). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1301.) |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 435.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 439 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 472 | Amended Code | Citation Text |