CA AB643 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3074.2 to the Labor Code, relating to apprenticeship.
Title
Apprenticeship programs: career fairs.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB643 Ramos By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 643 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 643 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2219.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1694.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and L., P.E. & R. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1408.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3074.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |