CA AB643 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 332, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 332, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8594.10 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: Silver Alerts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB643 Nazarian By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 643 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 643 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 332, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2277.). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1479.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8594.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |