CA AB642 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 4.8 (commencing with Section 13675) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement agency regulation.
Title
Law enforcement agencies: facial recognition technology.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13675 | New Code | See Bill Text |