CA AB641 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 9624 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation electrification.
Title
Transportation electrification: local publicly owned electric utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 641 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 641 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 13). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 1712.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 12). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 9624 | New Code | See Bill Text |