CA AB64 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 35400.6 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: fifth-wheel travel trailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 64 DONNELLY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB64 Donnelly By Wyland (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 64 DONNELLY Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2013-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3291.).
2013-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3197.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2013-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2328.).
2013-09-10SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2013-08-27SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-26SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
2013-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2013-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2013-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2013-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1475.).
2013-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-05-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-02-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2013-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2013-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code35400.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code38600Repealed CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code38601Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code38603Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code38604Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_64&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130107_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130207_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130417_amended_asm_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130417_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130508_amended_asm_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130508_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130701_amended_sen_v95.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130701_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130711_amended_sen_v94.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130711_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130107_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130207_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130417_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130508_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130701_amended_sen_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130711_amended_sen_v94.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130827_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20130918_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_bill_20131004_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_vote_20130422_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_vote_20130501_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_vote_20130516_1218PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_vote_20130709_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_vote_20130911_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_vote_20130911_1054AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_64_vote_20130912_1110AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback