CA AB637 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 33355) of Chapter 3 of Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school choice.
Title
School choice: G.I. Jr. Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-03-31 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33355 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |