CA AB636 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25503.4 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: tied-house restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 636 HALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB636 Hall By Wright (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 636 HALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB636 Hall By Wright (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 636 HALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2776.). |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1983.). |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1342.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25502.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |