CA AB631 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 216 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Martin Garrick [R] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB631 Ma By Simitian (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - Assembly - AB 631 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - Assembly - AB 631 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2200.). | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-06-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1853.) | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1690.) | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-14 | Withdrawn from committee pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(b). Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-03-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |