CA AB630 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44125 and 44258.4 of, and to add Sections 44124, 44124.5, 44125.5, and 44127 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Vehicles: retirement and replacement.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 630 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB630 Cooper By Stern (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 630 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB630 Cooper By Stern (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 630 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 3397.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2853.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on EQ. and T. & H. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 1985.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44124 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44124.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44125.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44127 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44258.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |