CA AB63 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12509, 12509.5, 12660, and 12814.6 of, and to add Section 11103.5 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to driver’s licenses.
Title
Driver’s licenses: instruction permits and provisional licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 63 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB63 Frazier et al. By Newman (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 63 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB63 Frazier et al. By Newman (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 63 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-07 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 3256.). |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3206.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2713.). |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 21. Page 2084.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on April 5 corrected. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-12-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 12. |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11103.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12509.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12814.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |