CA AB629 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1450.1 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans cemetery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB629 Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 629 MONNING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 629 MONNING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2018.). | |
2011-08-17 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-13 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1450.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |