CA AB621 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2750.8 to the Labor Code, and to add Article 8.6 (commencing with Section 1160) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drayage truck operators: Motor Carrier Employer Amnesty

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 621 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB621 Roger Hern (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 621 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 3061.).
2015-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2015-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2639.).
2015-09-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-31SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
2015-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2015-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 1877.)
2015-06-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
2015-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2015-02-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2015-02-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1160New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code2750.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code2750.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_621&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_bill_20150224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_bill_20150601_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_bill_20150625_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_bill_20150831_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_bill_20150904_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_bill_20150914_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_bill_20151010_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150408_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150603_0350PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150707_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150817_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150909_0513PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_621_vote_20150910_1201PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback