CA AB621 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1936 of the Civil Code, relating to vehicle rental agreements.
Title
Vehicle rental agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 621 Charles Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CALDERON (Y: 66 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB621 Charles Calderon By DeSaulnier (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - AB 621 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB621 Charles Calderon By Calderon (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Assembly - AB 621 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB621 Charles Calderon By DeSaulnier (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - AB 621 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB621 Charles Calderon By Calderon (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Assembly - AB 621 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 13. Page 3204.). | |
2011-09-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 2446.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2447.). | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Page 2399.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-08 | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments and whereby the bill was ordered to enrollment. Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2011-09-02 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 2855.). | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2170.). | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-25 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 877.) | |
2011-04-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 5). | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1936 | New Code | See Bill Text |