CA AB620 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 27491.42 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Coroner: sudden unexplained death in childhood.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 620 Cooley Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB620 Cooley By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - [06-19-2019] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 620 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB620 Cooley By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - [06-19-2019] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 620 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 3314.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2512.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1348.) |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27491.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |