CA AB620 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 738, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 738, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 149.9 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
High-occupancy toll lanes: exemptions from tolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB620 Roger Hern (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - AB 620 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - AB 620 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 738, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5242.). |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 1). |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 3521.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3523.) |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 3496.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3497.) |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (January 11). |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 149.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |