CA AB619 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8596.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: emergency services: nonprofit service providers.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 619 Vince Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 619 Vince Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1800.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8596.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |