CA AB617 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 136, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 40920.6, 42400, and 42402 of, and to add Sections 39607.1, 40920.8, 42411, 42705.5, and 44391.2 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonvehicular air pollution: criteria air pollutants and toxic air contaminants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 617 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB617 Cristina Garcia By Lara (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 617 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 136, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-26 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2589.).
2017-07-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2585.)
2017-07-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2017-07-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2068.).
2017-07-17SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 17).
2017-07-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2012.)
2017-07-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2017-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code33540Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code370New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39607.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code40920.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code40920.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code42400Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code42402Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code42411New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code42705.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code44391.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback