CA AB615 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 189 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Office of Sustainable Water Solutions: technical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 615 RENDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1915.) |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12949.70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 189 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 189.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 79713.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |