CA AB614 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 9402.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Area agency on aging: Alzheimer’s disease and dementia: training and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 614 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 614 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1932.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9402.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |