CA AB614 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48321 of the Education Code, relating to school attendance.
Title
School attendance review boards: member composition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB614 Bonilla (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - AB 614 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - AB 614 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-06-23 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-06-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1536.). | |
2011-06-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). | |
2011-05-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-09 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1281.) | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |
2011-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |