CA AB613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1209 and 1632.55 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 1632 of, and to add and repeal Section 1632.56 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Dentists: clinical laboratories: license examinations.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 613 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 1352.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 10). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1632 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1632.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |