CA AB613 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1246.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to clinical laboratories.
Title
Healing arts: clinical laboratories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 613 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB613 Nazarian et al. By Hill (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 613 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB613 Nazarian et al. By Hill (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 613 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6846.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5775.). |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Newman. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1539.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1246.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |