CA AB61 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11770 of the Insurance Code, relating to the State Compensation Insurance Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Compensation Insurance Fund: board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-07 - Assembly - AB 61 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB61 Holden By Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB61 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 61 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3013.).
2017-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2457.).
2017-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-23SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-23SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2017-07-20SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2017-07-20AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2017-07-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2071.).
2017-07-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1483.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2017-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2016-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2016-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code11770Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback