CA AB609 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21082.1, 21091, 21092.2, 21108, and 21152 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: notices and documents: electronic filing and posting.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 609 Levine Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 609 Levine Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1190.) |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21082.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |